CA AR40 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-16)
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Read. Adopted. (Page 2156.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Latina Action Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Latina Action Day.

Sponsors

Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]
Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 2156.).
2019-05-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2019-05-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-17AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback