CA AR36 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2129.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Advanced Placement Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Advanced Placement Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - Assembly - HR 36 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2129.).
2019-05-24AssemblyOrdered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-05-07AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback