CA AR32 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1593.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1593.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week.
Title
Relative to Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - Assembly - HR 32 Mullin Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1593.). |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Introduced. |