CA AR31 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-5)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1781.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Harvey Milk Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Harvey Milk Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 1781.).
2019-05-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 16).
2019-05-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-30AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback