CA AR30 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1522.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-17-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1522.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Day of the Teacher.
Title
Relative to the Day of the Teacher.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 1522.). |
2019-05-06 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2). |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Introduced. |