CA AR29 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-18-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1244.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-18-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Read. Adopted. (Page 1244.).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to College Bound Day.
Title
Relative to College Bound Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 1244.). |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Introduced. |