CA AR26 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-18-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Read. Adopted. (Page 646.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-18-1)
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Read. Adopted. (Page 646.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women’s History Month.
Title
Relative to Women’s History Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 646.). |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 4). |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. |