CA AR26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 918.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Assyrian New Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the Assyrian New Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Assembly - HR 26 Flora Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 918.).
2019-03-25AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 25).
2019-03-21AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-18AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback