CA AR12 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to voter education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to voter education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-18 - Assembly - HR 12 GOMEZ Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18AssemblyRead. Adopted.
2017-05-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10).
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended.
2017-05-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-05-01AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Amended.
2017-04-27AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2017-01-30AssemblyIntroduced.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback