CA AR115 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-17-1)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Read. Adopted.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Sikhism.
Title
Relative to Sikhism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 4). |
2022-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Introduced. |