CA AR11 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-12-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 681.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-12-1)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 681.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Rosa Parks’ 106th Birthday.
Title
Relative to Rosa Parks’ 106th Birthday.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Assembly - HR 11 Reyes Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 681.). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 11). |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Introduced. |