CA AR105 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5041.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-21-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Read. Adopted. (Page 5041.).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Day of the Teacher.
Title
Relative to the Day of the Teacher.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 5041.). |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Introduced. |