CA AR104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Introduced measure version corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-03 - Introduced measure version corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Title
Relative to Cinco de Mayo Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-03 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 4504.). |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-04 | Assembly | Introduced. |