CA AJR9 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-9)
Status: Passed on September 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the March for Science.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The March for Science.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-07 - Assembly - AJR 9 STONE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR9 Mark Stone et al. By Stern (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - AJR 9 STONE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-19AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 162, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2017-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 3025.).
2017-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2017-09-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 1. Page 2472.)
2017-06-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-28SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-06-07SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 7).
2017-05-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-04-24SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-04-20AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 1140.)
2017-04-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 17).
2017-04-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-03-31AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-03-30AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback