CA AJR7 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-20-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-20-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to veterans business enterprise.
Title
Veterans: first businesses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-06 - Senate - Special Consent #4 AJR7 Mathis (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AJR7 MATHIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Assembly - AJR7 MATHIS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-21 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-07-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2015-07-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1793.) |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2015-06-24 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-05-22 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1539.) |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1429.) |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on V.A. Amended. |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |