CA AJR50 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-8)
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to vehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal Clean Air Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AJR 50 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 8. Page 7042.)
2018-08-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-23AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 20).
2018-08-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-08-07AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-08-06AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback