CA AJR50 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vehicular air pollution.
Title
Federal Clean Air Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AJR 50 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 8 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 8. Page 7042.) |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (August 20). |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |