CA AJR5 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-3)
Status: Engrossed on August 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-08-25 - Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to wild free-roaming horses and burros.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wild free-roaming horses and burros: protection: roundup moratorium.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-16 - Assembly - AJR 5 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-25SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2021-08-17SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-08-16AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 4.)
2021-08-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-07-01AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (July 1).
2021-06-29AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2021-06-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Amended.
2021-06-14AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-14AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2021-04-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2021-04-12AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2021-02-02AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-02-01AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback