CA AJR47 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 62-7)
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to climate change and coastal resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate change and coastal resources.

Sponsors

Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Kevin de Leon [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]Sen. Jerry Hill [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]
Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Sen. William Monning [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Sen. Henry Stern [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AJR 47 BLOOM Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2018-08-30AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (August 27).
2018-08-24AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2018-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-08-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-07-02AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback