CA AJR45 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-19-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-06 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 68th anniversary of the Korean War.
Title
Korean War: 68th anniversary: peace talks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Assembly - AJR 45 CHOI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-06 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 6101.) |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-22 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |