CA AJR45 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-20)
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 68th anniversary of the Korean War.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Korean War: 68th anniversary: peace talks.

Sponsors

Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Travis Allen [R]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Jay Obernolte [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Assembly - AJR 45 CHOI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-07-05AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 0. Page 6101.)
2018-07-05AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2018-07-02AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2018-06-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-06-21AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback