CA AJR45 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-1)
Status: Passed on September 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-1)
Status: Passed on September 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to civil rights.
Title
Civil rights: the Equality Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Assembly - AJR 45 CHIU Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR45 Chiu By Leno (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-09 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - AJR 45 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR45 Chiu By Leno (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-09 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Assembly - AJR 45 CHIU Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-01 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 169, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-09-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 11. Page 6218.). |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 5237.) |
2016-08-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 9). |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 11. Page 5484.) |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 21). |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-06-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |