CA AJR44 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to trade with the People’s Republic of China.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trade with the People’s Republic of China.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AJR 44 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2018-08-28AssemblyAmended. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2018-08-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27).
2018-06-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-06-20AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback