CA AJR44 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on August 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-31 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to trade with the People’s Republic of China.
Title
Trade with the People’s Republic of China.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - AJR 44 LOW Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 7051.) |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |