CA AJR42 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on September 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Title X.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Title X: family planning.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR42 Kamlager-Dove et al. By Leyva (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - AJR 42 KAMLAGER-DOVE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 15 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 198, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-05AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2018-08-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 5902.)
2018-08-24SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-08-20AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 15. Page 6389.)
2018-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2018-08-14AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-06-11AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback