CA AJR42 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-18-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-18-1)
Status: Passed on August 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the transport by rail of flammable and combustible liquids.
Title
Transport by rail of flammable and combustible liquids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-22 - Assembly - AJR 42 DODD Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR42 Dodd By Wolk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Assembly - AJR 42 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-15 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR42 Dodd By Wolk (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Assembly - AJR 42 DODD Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 152, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6050.). |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2016-08-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4977.) |
2016-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5584.) |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |