CA AJR42 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-27 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Allen.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Department of Defense directed budget cuts.
Title
Department of Defense budget cuts.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Dutton [R] | Sen. Bill Emmerson [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Asm. Jeff Miller [R] |
Asm. Brian Nestande [R] | Asm. Manuel Perez [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-08-14 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-27 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Allen. | |
2012-08-15 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 14). | |
2012-08-09 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |
2012-06-21 | From printer. | |
2012-06-20 | Introduced. To print. |