CA AJR4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Assembly - AJR 4 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 11).
2019-06-04SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-28SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-03-14SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-03-04SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-02-28AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 14. Page 530.)
2019-02-28AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-02-26AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (February 26).
2019-01-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2019-01-18AssemblyFrom printer.
2019-01-17AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback