CA AJR36 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-3)
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the 136th anniversary of the Chinese Exclusion Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

136th anniversary of the Chinese Exclusion Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR36 Ting et al. By Pan (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Assembly - AJR 36 TING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 27 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-15AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-15AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-08-09SenateAdopted and to Assembly.
2018-06-27SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 26).
2018-05-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-07SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-05-03AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 0. Page 5003.)
2018-05-03AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-02AssemblyAmended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2018-04-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-20AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-03-19AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback