CA AJR35 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-20)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-30 - Measure version as amended on April 26 corrected.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a Polish law on speech related to the Holocaust.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Polish law: Holocaust speech.

Sponsors

Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Josh Newman [D]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Sen. Henry Stern [D]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]
Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Bob Wieckowski [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]

Roll Calls

2018-05-29 - Assembly - AJR 35 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-30SenateMeasure version as amended on April 26 corrected.
2018-05-30SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-05-29AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5375.)
2018-05-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-05-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14).
2018-04-30AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2018-04-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-03-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback