CA AJR34 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-17-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-08-03 - Referred to Com. on JUD.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to refugees.
Title
World Refugee Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Assembly - AJR 34 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0.) |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |