CA AJR29 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-6)
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to new Outer Continental Shelf oil and gas operations in federal waters offshore California.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas: offshore drilling: operations: leases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR29 Limón et al. By Jackson (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Assembly - AJR 29 LIMÓN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 9 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2018.
2018-03-07AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
2018-03-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2018-03-05SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 5. Page 4318.)
2018-02-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-02-12SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2018-02-08AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 9. Page 3951.)
2018-02-08AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-02-06AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (February 5).
2018-02-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-01-31AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-01-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Amended.
2018-01-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-01-22AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Amended.
2018-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-01-17AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-01-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback