CA AJR28 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-16-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Bernard B. James.
Title
Bernard B. James.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR28 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - AJR 28 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Assembly - AJR 28 Cristina Garcia Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 56, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-05-13 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3646.) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2022-04-13 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on M. & V.A. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3910.) |
2022-03-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 15). |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |