CA AJR26 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-15-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-15-1)
Status: Passed on September 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to student loans.
Title
Student loan debt repayment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AJR 26 Medina Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR26 Medina et al. By Leyva (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - AJR 26 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR26 Medina et al. By Leyva (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - AJR 26 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5096.) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4367.) |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 5). |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |