CA AJR25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Mexican braceros.
Title
Mexican braceros: settlement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR25 Reyes et al. By Hueso (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AJR 25 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AJR 25 REYES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2936.) |
2017-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3146.) |
2017-09-08 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 2973.) |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | From printer. |
2017-08-30 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |