CA AJR22 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-0)
Status: Passed on September 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol.
Title
Select Committee to Investigate the January 6th Attack on the United States Capitol.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR22 Gabriel et al. By Becker (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - AJR 22 GABRIEL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - AJR 22 GABRIEL Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 173, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2022-08-29 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 0. Page 5173.) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (March 8). |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-11 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 2. Page 3258.) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3257.) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Without reference to committee. |
2022-01-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |