CA AJR22 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-04 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-04 - In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the 76th anniversary of the repeal of the Chinese Exclusion Act.
Title
76th anniversary of the repeal Chinese Exclusion Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Assembly - AJR 22 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-04 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 3. Page 2949.) |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |