CA AJR2 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-18-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to coastal and marine waters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Coastal and marine waters: Santa Catalina Island: dichloro-diphenyl-trichloroethane.

Sponsors

Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Sen. Henry Stern [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-09-07 - Assembly - AJR 2 O'Donnell Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-09-02 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR2 O'Donnell et al. By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AJR 2 O'Donnell Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 142, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
2021-09-07AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.).
2021-09-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2021-09-02SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.)
2021-07-13SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-07-12SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-06-24SenateOrdered to third reading.
2021-06-21SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-06-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Com. on E.Q.
2021-05-03SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-04-29AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1246.)
2021-04-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-21AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21).
2021-04-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer.
2020-12-07AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback