CA AJR2 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the federal Pell Grant Program.
Title
The federal Pell Grant Program awards.
Sponsors
Asm. Randy Voepel [R] | Asm. Phillip Chen [R] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Tyler Diep [R] |
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - AJR 2 Voepel Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - AJR 2 Voepel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - AJR 2 Voepel Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 98, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2366.). |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1607.) |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 815.) |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Amended. |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2019-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-01-07 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |