CA AJR19 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-16)
Status: Passed on August 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-16)
Status: Passed on August 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to military service.
Title
Military service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR19 Alejo By Hueso (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - AJR 19 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - AJR 19 ALEJO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2110.) |
2015-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 2146.) |
2015-06-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 23). |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |