CA AJR18 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-10 - Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area.
Title
Santa Monica Mountains National Recreation Area.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - AJR 18 Luz Rivas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-07-01 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 0. Page 2454.) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 18). |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |