CA AJR18 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-26-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-26-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the federal Wildfire Disaster Funding Act.
Title
Federal Wildfire Disaster Funding Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-20 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AJR18 Patterson (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Assembly - AJR 18 PATTERSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-07-14 - Senate - Be adopted and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Assembly - AJR 18 PATTERSON Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-25 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-08-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m. |
2015-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-08-20 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2111.) |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-07-15 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). |
2015-07-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2230.) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Amended. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From printer. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |