CA AJR16 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-1-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to immigration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Immigration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR16 Reyes et al. By Hueso (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-28 - Assembly - AJR 16 Reyes Assembly Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 119, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-07 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2021-08-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-08-30SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.).
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-07-07SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-29SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-06-28AssemblyAdopted and to Senate.
2021-06-28AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-06-22AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 22).
2021-05-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-19AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-05-18AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback