CA AJR15 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-13-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-13-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to refugees.
Title
World Refugee Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR15 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - AJR 15 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - AJR 15 McCarty Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-07-20 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | |
2021-07-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1992.) |
2021-07-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6). |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2039.) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 8). |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Amended. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | From printer. |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |