CA AJR15 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to federal public lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal public lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR15 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Dodd (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - AJR 15 AGUIAR-CURRY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 85, Statutes of 2017.
2017-06-13AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2017-06-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-06-08SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 1463.)
2017-06-05SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 5).
2017-06-01SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-05-30SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-05-26AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 1716.)
2017-05-26AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-23AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (May 23).
2017-05-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-05-16AssemblyFrom printer.
2017-05-15AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback