CA AJR14 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-17-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-17-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Special Olympics.
Title
Special Olympics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Assembly - AJR 14 Lackey Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR14 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - AJR 14 Lackey Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AJR14 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - AJR 14 Lackey Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 146, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2946.). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2327.) |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2487.) |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 19). |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Amended. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From printer. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |