CA AJR12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to veterans’ educational benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans’ educational benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR12 Stone et al. By Borgeas (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Assembly - AJR 12 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-07 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 118, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-07 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2021-08-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-08-26SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.)
2021-07-07SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 6).
2021-05-19SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-05-06SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2021-05-06AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1340.)
2021-05-04AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 4).
2021-04-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-16AssemblyFrom printer.
2021-04-15AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback