CA AJR1 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 56-12-1)
Status: Passed on February 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Vietnamese refugees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vietnamese refugees.

Sponsors

Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Tyler Diep [R]Sen. Tom Umberg [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Sen. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Sen. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Christy Smith [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Assembly - AJR 1 Daly Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR1 Daly et al. By Umberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Assembly - Bill Votes (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-18 - Assembly - AJR 1 DALY Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-22AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 8, Statutes of 2019.
2019-02-22AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2019-02-19AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 386.).
2019-02-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-02-11SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 159.)
2019-02-06SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-02-04SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2019-01-22SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2019-01-18AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 197.)
2019-01-18AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-01-17AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 17).
2019-01-16AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-01-15AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended.
2019-01-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-12-15AssemblyFrom printer.
2018-12-14AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback