CA AJR1 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the presidential elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Presidential elections: electoral college.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR1 Low et al. By Hill (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Be adopted. Ordered to third reading (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Assembly - AJR 1 LOW Assembly Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-28AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 122, Statutes of 2017.
2017-08-28AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2017-08-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2017-08-21SenateAdopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2173.)
2017-06-06SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 6).
2017-05-24SenateRe-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2017-05-16SenateIn Senate. To Com. on RLS.
2017-05-15AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 1531.)
2017-05-15AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 10).
2017-05-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E. & R.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Amended.
2017-01-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2016-12-06AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-12-05AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback