CA AJR1 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to a federal constitutional convention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Federal constitutional convention: application.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR1 Gatto By DeSaulnier (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Assembly - AJR1 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-08-26 - Assembly - AJR1 GATTO Assembly Third Reading Amend By GATTO Set #1 (Y: 52 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-27AssemblyChaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 77, Statutes of 2014.
2014-06-27AssemblyEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2014-06-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2014-06-23SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4048.).
2014-06-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2014-06-11SenateFrom committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 10).
2014-02-06SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2014-01-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2014-01-30AssemblyAdopted and to Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 20. Page 3743.)
2014-01-27AssemblyFrom inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
2013-09-11AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Atkins.
2013-08-26AssemblyRead and amended. (Page 2695.)
2013-08-22AssemblyFrom inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
2013-05-20AssemblyOrdered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Gatto.
2013-04-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 2).
2013-01-24AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2012-12-04AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 3. (pursuant to Joint Rules 4 and 6 this resolution will be treated as a bill.)
2012-12-03AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ajr_1&sess=1314&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20121203_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20121203_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20130826_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20140624_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_bill_20140627_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20130402_000001_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20130826_1219PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20140130_0933AM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20140610_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/asm/ab_0001-0050/ajr_1_vote_20140623_0148PM_sen_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback